CA SB1361 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 1367.243 of, to add Section 1385.007 to, to add and repeal Section 1367.52 of, and to repeal and add Section 1385.001 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend, repeal and add Section 10123.205 of, and to add and repeal Section 10123.66 of, the Insurance Code, relating to prescription drugs.
Title
Prescription drugs: cost sharing: pharmacy benefit managers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3543.) (April 27). |
2022-04-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | April 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B., P. & E.D. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.243 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.205 | New Code | See Bill Text |