CA SB1361 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 699, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 699, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 329, 331, and 583 of, and to add Section 331.5 to, the Financial Code, relating to the Department of Business Oversight.
Title
Department of Business Oversight: administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1361 Bradford Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1361 Bradford Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1361 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1361 Bradford Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1361 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 699, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5835.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 5578.) |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Set for hearing August 21. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5450.) Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2018-08-16 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6312.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). |
2018-07-02 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | June 11 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4942.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4745.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 1078 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 329 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 331 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 331.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Financial Code | 583 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 7102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |