CA SB1358 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 426, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 426, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to state claims, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
State claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1358 Portantino Third Reading Urgency By Holden (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1358 Portantino Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1358 Portantino Urgency Clause (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1358 Portantino Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1358 Portantino Urgency Clause (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 426, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5384.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 10). |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4570.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4440.) (June 27). |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Set for hearing June 27. |
2022-06-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |