CA SB1357 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 205.5.1 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Property taxation: exemption: disabled veteran homeowners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB1357 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB1357 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-06-13 | Assembly | June 13 hearing: Heard for testimony only. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and M. & V.A. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3936.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3794.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3516.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3377.) (April 7). |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and M. & V.A. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 205.5.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |