CA SB1355 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 333, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 333, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 4577 to the Penal Code, relating to unmanned aircraft systems.
Title
Unmanned aircraft systems: correctional facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-20 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1355 Hill Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1355 Hill Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1355 Hill (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - ? (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1355 Hill Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1355 Hill (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - ? (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 333, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5429.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-16 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6312.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and PUB. S. |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4759.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4516.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 4577 | New Code | See Bill Text |