CA SB1345 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on September 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 489, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on September 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 489, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4597.22 of the Public Resources Code and to amend Sections 8704.2, 73502, and 73514 of the Water Code, relating to natural resources.
Title
Natural resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-18 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1345 Committee on N.R. & W. (Pavley) Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - SB 1345 N.R.& W. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Senate - Special Consent #14 SB1345 Committee on N.R. & W. (Pavley) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - SB 1345 N.R.& W. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Senate - Special Consent #14 SB1345 Committee on N.R. & W. (Pavley) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 489, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4563.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6048.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6). |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 (pending re-referral to L. Gov.) suspended. (Page 5488.) |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and L. GOV. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3468.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3387.) (May 5). |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3215.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 1798.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4597.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 73502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 73514 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 8704.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |