CA SB1344 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - April 4 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 4533.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - April 4 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 4533.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 66202.1 to, and to add Article 19.1 (commencing with Section 69995) to Chapter 2 of Part 42 of Division 5 of Title 3 of, the Education Code, and to amend Section 23712 of, and to add Sections 17052.20 and 17132.2 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to education expenses, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Education expenses: Education Savings Account Act of 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-04-2018]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Senate | April 4 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 4533.) Reconsideration granted. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED., GOV. & F., and JUD. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66202.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17052.20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17132.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23712 | Amended Code | Citation Text |