CA SB1340 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-13 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-13 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1487 to, and to add and repeal Section 1488 of, the Water Code, relating to water resources.
Title
Appropriation of water: Sewerage Commission Oroville.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1340 La Malfa Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1340 La Malfa Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Special Consent #10 SB1340 La Malfa (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1340 La Malfa Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Special Consent #10 SB1340 La Malfa (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-13 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2012-09-13 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2012-08-24 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2012-08-21 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4627.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-16 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-16 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5969.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-13 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-08-09 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). | |
2012-07-02 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-20 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W. | |
2012-05-25 | Referred to Com. on W., P. & W. | |
2012-05-14 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-14 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3497.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-09 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2012-05-02 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-01 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3388.) (April 30). | |
2012-04-20 | Set for hearing April 30. | |
2012-04-09 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-03-29 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3022.) (March 27). | |
2012-03-20 | Set for hearing March 27. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-25 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 1487 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 1488 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |