CA SB1334 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 845, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 845, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 512.1 to the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Meal and rest periods: hospital employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1334 Bradford Senate Third Reading By Kalra (Y: 59 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1334 Bradford Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1334 Bradford (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1334 Bradford Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1334 Bradford (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 845, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 5338.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11). |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | June 29 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 3874.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3792.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 18 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3309.) (April 4). |
2022-03-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 512.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |