CA SB133 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 1.1 (commencing with Section 7283.60) to Part 1.7 of Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to hosting platforms.
Title
Transient occupancy taxes: hosting platforms: collection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-16 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Local Government (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB133 McGuire (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB133 McGuire (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | June 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-06-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2016-06-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 927.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | April 22 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 404.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 24. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and HEALTH. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 22. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 24204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7283.60 | New Code | See Bill Text |