CA SB133 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 563, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 563, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 9.3 (commencing with Section 31142.20) to Chapter 1 of Part 5 of Division 12 of the Water Code, relating to the Alameda County Water District.
Title
Groundwater: wells, exploratory holes, and other
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-08-27 - Assembly - SB 133 Corbett Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-26 - Senate - Special Consent #6 SB133 Corbett (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-26 - Senate - Special Consent #6 SB133 Corbett (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 563, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by Governor. | |
2009-09-10 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m. | |
2009-09-08 | Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Ordered held in Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2009-08-28 | Enrolled. To Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2009-08-27 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-08-27 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2759.) To Senate. | |
2009-08-20 | To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-07-16 | From Consent Calendar to third reading. | |
2009-07-09 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-07-08 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 8.) | |
2009-06-30 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 30.) | |
2009-06-15 | To Com. on W.,P. & W. | |
2009-05-26 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-05-26 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1010.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-21 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-20 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-19 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-05-12 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-08 | Set for hearing May 18. | |
2009-05-04 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-30 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 678.) | |
2009-03-27 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2009-03-24 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 340.) Re-referred to Com. on EQ. | |
2009-03-18 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2009-03-12 | Set for hearing March 24. | |
2009-02-23 | To Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ. | |
2009-02-10 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 12. | |
2009-02-09 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |