CA SB1319 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - June 3 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 3639.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - June 3 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 3639.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 64, 480.1, 480.2, and 482 of, to add Section 480.9 to, and to add and repeal Section 486 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Property taxation: change in ownership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-03 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [06-03-2020]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | Senate | June 3 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 3639.) Reconsideration granted. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Set for hearing June 3. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 480.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 480.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 480.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 482 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 486 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 64 | Amended Code | Citation Text |