CA SB1314 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 399, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 399, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 1030, 1032.5, 1328, 1330, 1332, 1334, 1377, 3654.4, 3655, 3656, 3701, 4655, 4656, and 4701 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to unemployment insurance.
Title
Unemployment insurance benefits: determination: appeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1314 Monning Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Assembly - SB 1314 Monning Senate Third Reading By PEREA (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Senate - Special Consent #14 SB1314 Monning (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Assembly - SB 1314 Monning Senate Third Reading By PEREA (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Senate - Special Consent #14 SB1314 Monning (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 399, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4688.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6230.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2014-06-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3468.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3258.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Unemployment Insurance Code | 1030 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 1032.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 1328 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 1330 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 1332 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 1334 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 1377 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 3654.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 3655 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 3656 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 3701 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 4655 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 4656 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 4701 | Amended Code | Citation Text |