CA SB1311 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 843, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 843, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1288.85 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities.
Title
Hospitals: antimicrobial stewardship.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1311 Hill Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1311 Hill Senate Third Reading By PAN (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1311 Hill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1311 Hill Senate Third Reading By PAN (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1311 Hill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 843, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4474.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5969.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 5912.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3416.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3280.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 120130 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1288.85 | New Code | See Bill Text |