CA SB1306 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Division 31.5 (commencing with Section 55000) of the Public Resources Code, relating to recycling.
Title
Recycling: precious metals and critical minerals: report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3754.) (April 24). |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3605.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and E.Q. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 55000 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |