CA SB1302 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 4.7 (commencing with Section 49469) to Chapter 9 of Part 27 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to pupil health, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Pupil health: school-based health centers: grant program: Mental Health Services Act: Mental Health Services Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1302 Portantino Senate Third Reading By Blanca Rubio (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1302 Portantino et al. Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1302 Portantino (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1302 Portantino et al. Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1302 Portantino (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2022-09-27 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 5337.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3970.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3791.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | April 4 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3203.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 49469 | New Code | See Bill Text |