CA SB130 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 20, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 20, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to the King City Joint Union High School District, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
King City Joint Union High School District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-07-09 - Assembly - SB 130 Denham Third Reading Urgency By CABALLERO (Y: 67 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB130 Denham Urgency Clause (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB130 Denham Urgency Clause (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 20, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-07-22 | Approved by Governor. | |
2009-07-15 | Enrolled. To Governor at 9:45 a.m. | |
2009-07-09 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-07-09 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 5. Page 2443.) To Senate. | |
2009-07-06 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-07-02 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 1.) | |
2009-06-25 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 24.) | |
2009-06-08 | To Com. on ED. | |
2009-06-01 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-06-01 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 3. Page 1098.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-28 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 1068.) Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-22 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2009-05-11 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2009-05-08 | Set for hearing May 11. | |
2009-05-06 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-05 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 725.) | |
2009-04-24 | Set for hearing April 29. | |
2009-04-22 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-04-13 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-04-03 | Set for hearing April 22. | |
2009-02-23 | To Com. on ED. | |
2009-02-10 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 12. | |
2009-02-09 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |