CA SB1295 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 430, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 430, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2962 of the Penal Code, relating to mentally ill prisoners.
Title
Mentally ill prisoners.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Senate - Special Consent SB1295 Nielsen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1295 Nielsen Senate Third Reading By IRWIN (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1295 Nielsen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1295 Nielsen Senate Third Reading By IRWIN (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1295 Nielsen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 430, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5497.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 6017.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4052.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4007.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3614.) (April 19). |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 2962 | Amended Code | Citation Text |