CA SB1290 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 340, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 223.2 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juveniles: costs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-24 - Assembly - SB 1290 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Chiu (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1290 Durazo et al (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 340, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-01SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
2020-08-24SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-08-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 4. Page 5173.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (August 18).
2020-08-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-27AssemblyAugust 3 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-06-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-06-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 3677.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-06-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-08SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2020-06-03SenateSet for hearing June 9.
2020-05-28SenateJune 1 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-05-26SenateSet for hearing June 1.
2020-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3569.) (May 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-12SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2020-03-18SenateMarch 31 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-03-12SenateSet for hearing March 31.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-02-24SenateRead first time.
2020-02-24SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
2020-02-21SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code223.2New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback