CA SB1288 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-21 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 2. Page 3217.) Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-21 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 2. Page 3217.) Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 3517.55 to the Government Code, relating to public employment.
Title
State public employment: memoranda of understanding: legislative approval.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Huff [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-21 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-21 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 2. Page 3217.) Reconsideration granted. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 3517.55 | New Code | See Bill Text |