CA SB1276 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - April 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - April 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 2 (commencing with Section 1798.78.1) to Title 1.8 of Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code, relating to privacy.
Title
Shared mobility service data.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | April 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1798.78.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |