CA SB1274 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - April 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - April 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1798.24 of the Civil Code, and to amend Sections 102645, 102680, and 102705 of, to add Sections 102620, 102706, and 102707 to, and to repeal Section 102675 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to vital records.
Title
Vital records: adoptees’ birth certificates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | April 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1798.24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 102620 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 102645 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 102675 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 102680 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 102705 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 102706 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 102707 | New Code | See Bill Text |