CA SB1273 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-25 - May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-25 - May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11362.45 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 13388, 13557, 15300, 15302, 23136, 23152, 23153, and 23575.3 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: marijuana.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Senate | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | May 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 4629.) (April 10). |
2018-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11362.45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 13388 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 13557 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 15300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 15302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 23136 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 23152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 23153 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 23575.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |