CA SB1272 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 27, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 27, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 631 and 632.7 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Crimes: intercepting telephone communications.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Becker [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-09 - Assembly - SB 1272 Becker Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1272 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1272 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 27, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-06-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-06-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |
2022-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 5306.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 1). |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3646.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3519.) (April 26). |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | May 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 631 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 632.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |