CA SB1271 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 23 (commencing with Section 26300) to Division 20 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 312.5 of the Vehicle Code, relating to public safety.
Title
Electric bicycles, powered mobility devices, and storage batteries.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Min [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 3722.) (April 23). |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3535.) (April 9). |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 26300 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 312.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |