CA SB1265 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 398, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 398, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25722.7 of the Public Resources Code, relating to state vehicles.
Title
State vehicle fleet purchases: minimum fuel economy standard.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1265 Hueso Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1265 Hueso Senate Third Reading By FRAZIER (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1265 Hueso (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1265 Hueso Senate Third Reading By FRAZIER (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1265 Hueso (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 398, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4940.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 2. Page 6573.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 14). |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3644.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3713.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3212.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14842.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 25722.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |