CA SB1263 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-19 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-19 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 38599.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution.
Title
California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006:
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Wyland [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-19 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-03-26 | Set for hearing April 19. | |
2010-03-04 | To Com. on EQ. | |
2010-02-20 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1263&sess=0910&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1263_bill_20100219_introduced.html |