CA SB1262 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2220.05 of, to add Article 25 (commencing with Section 2525) to Chapter 5 of Division 2 of, and to add Part 5 (commencing with Section 18100) to Division 7 of, the Business and Professions Code, to add Section 23028 to the Government Code, and to amend Section 11362.775 of, and to add Article 8 (commencing with Section 111658) to Chapter 6 of Part 5 of Division 104 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to medical marijuana, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Medical marijuana.
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Correa [D] | Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1262 Correa (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1262 Correa (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2014-08-13 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5998.) |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected August 7.) |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 26). |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 5690.) |
2014-06-24 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-06-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B.,P. & C.P. and PUB. S. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3659.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3713.) (May 23). |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3344.) (April 30). |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3211.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2220.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2525 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 23028 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 111657 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 111658 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11362.775 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7295 | New Code | See Bill Text |