CA SB1258 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4071 and 4072 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 11151, 11158, 11164, 11164.1, 11164.5, 11165, 11165.1, 11165.5, 11166, and 11200 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.
Title
Controlled substances: prescriptions: reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Senate | Held in committee and under submission. |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3311.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Set for hearing April 29. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3211.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4071 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4072 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11151 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11158 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11164 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11164.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11164.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11165 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11165.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11165.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11166 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |