CA SB1253 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10006, 10085.5, 10085.6, 10106, 10133.1, 10139, 10147.6, 10148, 10152, 10153, 10158, 10159, 10159.2, 10164, 10167.12, 10171.5, 10177, 10180, 10185, 10211, 10231.2, 10232.25, 10238, and 10451 of, and to add Section 10157.5 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to real estate and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Real estate brokers: limited liability companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | April 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3377.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |