CA SB1251 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 757, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 757, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7522.02 of the Government Code, relating to public employees' retirement.
Title
California Public Employees' Pension Reform Act of 2013: joint powers authority: employees.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Huff [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1251 Huff Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Assembly - SB 1251 Huff Senate Third Reading By CONWAY (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Senate - Special Consent #14 SB1251 Huff (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Assembly - SB 1251 Huff Senate Third Reading By CONWAY (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Senate - Special Consent #14 SB1251 Huff (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 757, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4910.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6488.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6341.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3467.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3217.) (April 21). |
2014-04-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. Set for hearing April 21. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 7522.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 7522.04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |