CA SB1248 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - April 18 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 1. Page 3415.)
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - April 18 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 1. Page 3415.)
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 436 to the Labor Code, relating to private employment.
Title
Minor league baseball players: contract restrictions.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Becker [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Senate | April 18 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 1. Page 3415.) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26 in JUD. pending receipt. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 436 | New Code | See Bill Text |