CA SB1247 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 840, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 840, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 94801, 94802, 94809, 94813, 94816, 94829, 94837, 94847, 94874, 94874.1, 94876, 94877, 94878, 94879, 94880, 94885, 94888, 94890, 94891, 94904, 94909, 94910, 94916, 94923, 94924, 94925, 94929.5, 94930.5, 94932.5, 94941, 94945, 94948, and 94950 of, to add Sections 94874.2, 94880.1, 94885.5, and 94947 to, to add and repeal Sections 94885.1 and 94929.9 of, and to repeal and add Section 94949 of, the Education Code, relating to private postsecondary education, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Private postsecondary education: California Private
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Lieu [D] | Asm. Susan Bonilla [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB1247 Lieu Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-28 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1247 Lieu Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS (Y: 57 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Business, Professions and Consumer Protection (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1247 Lieu (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Education (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-28 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1247 Lieu Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS (Y: 57 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Business, Professions and Consumer Protection (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1247 Lieu (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Education (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 840, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-29 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 5014.) Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 2. Page 4988.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4934.) Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 19. Page 6544.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6344.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 24). |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 10). |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 3. Page 3607.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3712.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3340.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3279.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30 in ED. pending receipt. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and ED. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |