CA SB1239 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25724 of the Public Resources Code, relating to the state vehicle fleet.
Title
State vehicle fleet: zero-emission vehicles: raw materials: child labor.
Sponsors
Sen. Shannon Grove [R] | Asm. Juan Alanis [R] | Sen. Steven Bradford [D] | Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
Sen. Rosilicie Ochoa Bogh [R] | Sen. Kelly Seyarto [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2024-04-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | April 17 hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | April 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and TRANS. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 25724 | Amended Code | Citation Text |