CA SB1224 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 44955.3 to the Education Code, relating to certificated school employees.
Title
Certificated school employees: assignments and reassignments: seniority: reporting.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Huff [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2016-04-20 | Senate | April 20 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 7. Page 3607.) |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44948 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44955.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |