CA SB1224 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 411, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 411, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 41700 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution.
Title
Air discharges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-17 - Assembly - SB 1224 Wright Senate Third Reading By HALL (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1224 Wright (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1224 Wright (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 411, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-28 | Approved by Governor. | |
2010-09-02 | Enrolled. To Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2010-08-17 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2010-08-17 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6291.) To Senate. | |
2010-06-23 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-06-22 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 21.) | |
2010-06-03 | To Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2010-05-24 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-05-24 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 2. Page 3583.) To Assembly. | |
2010-05-10 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2010-05-06 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3429.) | |
2010-04-27 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2010-04-15 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. | |
2010-04-13 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-04-07 | Set for hearing April 19. | |
2010-04-05 | Re-referred to Com. on EQ. | |
2010-03-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-03-04 | To Com. on RLS. | |
2010-02-19 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |
2010-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |