CA SB1222 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - June 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - June 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 679.75 to the Insurance Code, and to amend Sections 5003.1 and 6031.6 of the Penal Code, relating to detention facilities.
Title
Detention facilities: contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Senate | June 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Hearing rescheduled due to Capitol closure. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Set for hearing June 1. |
2020-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3540.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14 in INS. pending receipt. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 679.75 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 5003.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 6031.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |