CA SB1220 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2016 - 50% progression
Action: 2016-08-11 - August 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 16501.1 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to child welfare services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child welfare services: case plans: behavioral health services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-14 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate 3rd Reading SB1220 McGuire (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-11AssemblyAugust 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
2016-06-29AssemblyJune 29 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2016-06-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2016-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2016-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4051.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2016-05-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4006.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-05-20SenateSet for hearing May 27.
2016-05-02SenateMay 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2016-04-22SenateSet for hearing May 2.
2016-04-18SenateWithdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-04-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3518.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2016-04-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2016-03-31SenateSet for hearing April 12.
2016-03-28SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2016-03-23SenateMarch 29 hearing postponed by committee.
2016-03-15SenateSet for hearing March 29.
2016-03-03SenateReferred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
2016-02-19SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
2016-02-18SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1220&sess=1516&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1201-1250/sb_1220_bill_20160218_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1201-1250/sb_1220_bill_20160328_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1201-1250/sb_1220_bill_20160406_amended_sen_v97.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1201-1250/sb_1220_vote_20160412_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1201-1250/sb_1220_vote_20160527_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1201-1250/sb_1220_vote_20160531_0321PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1201-1250/sb_1220_vote_20160614_000001_asm_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback