CA SB1205 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-27 - In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-27 - In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Title 7.26 (commencing with Section 66720) of the Government Code, relating to disaster recovery.
Title
Bay Area Disaster Recovery Planning Council Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-25 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1205 Corbett (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1205 Corbett Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 52 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1205 Corbett (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-03 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1205 Corbett Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 52 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1205 Corbett (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-03 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-27 | In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto) | |
2010-09-25 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-09-03 | Enrolled. To Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2010-08-25 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 4906.) To enrollment. | |
2010-08-20 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-08-19 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 6362.) To Senate. | |
2010-08-17 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-16 | Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-13 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee August 12.) | |
2010-08-05 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-07-01 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 30.) | |
2010-06-14 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-06-10 | To Com. on L. GOV. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 3730.) To Assembly. | |
2010-06-01 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2010-05-28 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 3673.) | |
2010-05-21 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2010-05-03 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2010-04-23 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2010-04-22 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-04-16 | Set for hearing April 26. | |
2010-04-13 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-12 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3102.) | |
2010-03-24 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-03-09 | Set for hearing April 7. | |
2010-03-04 | To Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-02-19 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |
2010-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |