CA SB1200 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 883, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 883, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 683.050, 683.110, 683.120, 683.160, 683.170, and 685.010 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil procedure.
Title
Enforcement of judgments: renewal and interest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-23 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1200 Skinner Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1200 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Bauer-Kahan (Y: 55 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1200 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Bauer-Kahan Amendment Set #1 (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1200 Skinner (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1200 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Bauer-Kahan (Y: 55 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1200 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Bauer-Kahan Amendment Set #1 (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1200 Skinner (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 883, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5024.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-18 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 18. Page 5929.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 5817.) |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 28). |
2022-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 3901.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | May 9 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3437.) (April 19). |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | April 5 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 683.050 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 683.110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 683.120 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 683.160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 683.170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 685.010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |