CA SB12 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 541, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 541, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1770 of the Civil Code, and to add Article 6 (commencing with Section 12098.10) to Chapter 1.6 of Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to consumer affairs, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Consumer affairs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB12 Corbett Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Assembly - SB 12 Corbett Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB12 Corbett (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Assembly - SB 12 Corbett Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB12 Corbett (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 541, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 7 p.m. |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2280.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 3010.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 30). |
2013-08-21 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-07-02 | Assembly | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-26 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2013-06-25 | Assembly | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted. |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 1094.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1005.) (May 23). |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 566.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 388.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD. |
2012-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2012-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1770 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12098.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |