CA SB1197 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 8 (commencing with Section 65059.4) to Chapter 1.5 of Division 1 of Title 7 of the Government Code, relating to water.
Title
Water Innovation and Drought Resiliency Act of 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3439.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65059.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |