CA SB1194 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 839, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 839, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 118507 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to local government.
Title
Public restrooms: building standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1194 Allen Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1194 Allen Senate Third Reading By Ward (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1194 Allen (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1194 Allen Senate Third Reading By Ward (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1194 Allen (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 839, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5272.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3824.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3544.) (April 27). |
2022-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 28 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 118507 | New Code | See Bill Text |