CA SB1193 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-29 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-29 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11479 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.
Title
Controlled substances: destruction of seized marijuana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent #15 SB1193 Evans (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent #15 SB1193 Evans (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-29 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 14). |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3535.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3504.) (May 19). |
2014-05-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3311.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11362.85 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11473.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11479 | Amended Code | Citation Text |