CA SB1192 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Set for hearing May 16.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 16 in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Set for hearing May 16.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 16 in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17052.10, 19900, 19902, 19904, and 19906 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Personal Income Tax Law: Small Business Relief Act: elective tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3564.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17052.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19900 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19902 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19904 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19906 | Amended Code | Citation Text |