CA SB1188 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 179, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 179, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 3049 to the Family Code, relating to child custody.
Title
Child custody: disabled parent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-09 - Senate - Special Consent #30 SB1188 Wright (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Assembly - SB 1188 Wright Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1188 Wright (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Assembly - SB 1188 Wright Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1188 Wright (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 179, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-08-23 | Approved by Governor. | |
2010-08-11 | Enrolled. To Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2010-08-09 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4409.) To enrollment. | |
2010-08-04 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2010-08-02 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-08-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6006.) To Senate. | |
2010-06-30 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-06-29 | Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2010-06-28 | From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 15.) | |
2010-06-03 | To Com. on JUD. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-05-17 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-05-17 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3541.) To Assembly. | |
2010-05-12 | Read second time. Amended. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-05-11 | From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3444.) | |
2010-04-23 | Set for hearing May 4. | |
2010-04-22 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-04-13 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-04-12 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-04-09 | Set for hearing April 20. | |
2010-04-08 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-03-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I. | |
2010-03-05 | Set for hearing April 7. | |
2010-03-04 | To Coms. on B., F. & I. and JUD. | |
2010-02-19 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |
2010-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |