CA SB1186 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - May 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 25 in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 15 (commencing with Section 54999.8) to Part 1 of Division 2 of Title 5 of the Government Code, relating to law enforcement agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law enforcement agencies: surveillance: policies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-07 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-07SenateMay 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-24SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 17).
2018-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2018-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-03-12SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
2018-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code54999.8New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback