CA SB1183 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on TRANS. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities and Communications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on TRANS. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities and Communications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 44272 of the Health and Safety Code, to add Section 25229.1 to, and to add Chapter 4.1 (commencing with Section 25328) to Division 15 of, the Public Resources Code, and to amend Section 740.12 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Electric vehicle charging master plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on TRANS. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-04-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2020-03-19 | Senate | March 31 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing March 31. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and TRANS. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 44272 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 25229.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 740.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1183 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1183 |