CA SB1179 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - April 9 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - April 9 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11548.5 to the Government Code, relating to communications.
Title
Affordable Internet and Net Equality Act of 2024.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | April 9 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and E., U. & C. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11548.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |