CA SB1174 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - March 25 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 56337.5 of the Education Code, relating to special education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special education: dyslexia testing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenateMarch 25 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-03-06SenateSet for hearing March 25.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2020-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2020-02-20SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code56337.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback